Rucker et al v. Regions Bank et al

Plaintiff: Angela Rucker and Jerrell Rucker
Defendant: First Title, LLC, Collins-Maury, Inc., Jennie M. Holliday and Regions Bank
Undetermined: Donna L. Russell
Case Number: 2:2018cv02816
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: Tennessee Western District Court
0 Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
1 Judge: Thomas L Parker
2 Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the alternative, Transfer Venue filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Nahmias, Adam)
January 18, 2019 21 NOTICE by Collins-Maury, Inc. (Bradley, William)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order 20 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/7/19. (Sullivan, Daniel)
January 4, 2019 19 SETTING LETTER: Non-Jury Trial is set for Monday, 12/16/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 12/6/2019 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 11/25/2019. (jrs)
January 4, 2019 18 Minute Entryfor proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/4/2019. Adam M. Nahmias appeared for the Plaintiff. Locke Houston Waldrop, Robert F. Tom, William R. Bradley, and Mark J. Grai appeared for the Defendants. Motions heard and taken under advisement. Trial will remain non-jury at the present time. Non-Jury Trial set for Monday, 12/16/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Trial estimated to last 3 days. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 12/6/2019 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 11/25/2019. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Debi Pearce, Alpha Reporting) (jrs)
January 3, 2019 17 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Plaintiffs' Complaint for Money Damages and Other Relief by Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum-Regions Wire Report)(Tom, Robert)
December 31, 2018 16 NOTICE by Regions Bank Joint Rule 26(f) Planning Report (Tom, Robert)
December 28, 2018 15 ANSWER to Complaint by First Title, LLC.(Grai, Mark)
December 13, 2018 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the alternative, Transfer Venue by Jennie M. Holliday. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jennie M. Holliday, #2 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Sparkman, Joseph)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 12/11/18. (Sullivan, Daniel)
December 7, 2018 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Proposed Order Submitted by First Title, LLC. (Grai, Mark)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 12/4/18. (Sullivan, Daniel)
December 4, 2018 10 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Friday, 1/4/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs)
December 4, 2018 9 Notice of Correction to #8 Notice of Appearance . (Sparkman, Joseph)
December 4, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Sparkman, Jr on behalf of Jennie M. Holliday (Sparkman, Joseph)
December 4, 2018 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant Regions Bank's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum in Support (proposed order submitted) by Regions Bank. (Tom, Robert)
November 30, 2018 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla added. Judge Thomas L. Parker no longer assigned to case. (jld)
November 29, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Locke Houston Waldrop on behalf of Regions Bank (Waldrop, Locke)
November 28, 2018 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
November 28, 2018 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
November 28, 2018 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
November 28, 2018 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld)
November 28, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Regions Bank from Shelby County Chancery Court, case number CH-18-1531 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2935097), filed by Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-summons and complaint, #3 Exhibit B-other state court filings)(Tom, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rucker et al v. Regions Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Title, LLC
Represented By: Mark J. Grai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collins-Maury, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennie M. Holliday
Represented By: Joseph M. Sparkman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank
Represented By: Robert F. Tom
Represented By: Locke Houston Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Rucker
Represented By: Adam M. Nahmias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrell Rucker
Represented By: Adam M. Nahmias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Donna L. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?