Benson v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC

Plaintiff: Josephine Benson
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02874
Filed: December 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Mark S Norris
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 13 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference RESET to Friday, 08/02/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 1/29/19. (Norris, Mark)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Proposed Order Submitted) by Josephine Benson. (Kerney, Frank)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 03/22/2019 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.. (Ragan, Adam)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Ragan, Adam)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Josephine Benson as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Kerney, Frank)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
December 24, 2018 Filing 2 Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
December 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2953429), filed by Josephine Benson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kerney, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benson v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Adam C. Ragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Benson
Represented By: Frank H. Kerney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?