Riley v. InfoMart, Inc.

Plaintiff: Mark Anthony Riley
Defendant: InfoMart, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02883
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
1 Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 2/6/2019. (Vescovo, Diane)
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Thursday, 3/21/2019 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs)
February 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (UNOPPOSED (proposed order submitted) by InfoMart, Inc.. (Riley, Jennifer)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A. Riley on behalf of InfoMart, Inc. (Riley, Jennifer)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service Proof of Service served on Infomart, Inc. c/o registered agent David Matthews, Esq. - Ryan Davis on 01/07/2019, filed by Mark Anthony Riley. (Adkins, Micah)
January 1, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Correction to #1 Complaint . (Adkins, Micah)
December 31, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to InfoMart, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint filed by InfoMart, Inc. has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Filer failed to attach electronic signature to the complaint. Please resubmit under the event "Notice of Correction", which allows you to link the corrected complaint to docket entry #1. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2955189), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Adkins, Micah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riley v. InfoMart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InfoMart, Inc.
Represented By: Micah Stephen Adkins
Represented By: Jennifer A. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Anthony Riley
Represented By: Micah Stephen Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?