White v. IBERIABANK
Plaintiff: Carolyn White
Defendant: IBERIABANK
Case Number: 2:2019cv02018
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Parker
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by IBERIABANK. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Kern, Tracy)
February 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan G. Crone on behalf of Carolyn White (Crone, Alan)
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Ann Elizabeth Bailey on behalf of Carolyn White (Bailey, Laura Ann)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER Granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have until 02/19/2019 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 1/28/2019. (pab)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 1/28/2019. (pab)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2976394) by IBERIABANK. (Kern, Tracy)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint proposed order submitted by IBERIABANK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scarbrough, Tyler)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn White as to IBERIABANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Signed Green Card)(Dorsey, Bailey)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to IBERIABANK. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified against IBERIABANK (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2958761), filed by Carolyn White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification Page, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dorsey, Bailey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. IBERIABANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBERIABANK
Represented By: Tyler Phillip Scarbrough
Represented By: Tracy E. Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn White
Represented By: Bailey H. Dorsey
Represented By: Alan G. Crone
Represented By: Laura Ann Elizabeth Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?