S.A. Hospitality Group, Inc. v. Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: S.A. Hospitality Group, Inc.
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Undetermined: Donna Russell
Case Number: 2:2019cv02025
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Samuel H Mays
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #16 TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 02/20/2019. Attorney David E. Heiss is admitted to participate in this action as counsel for defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Mays, Samuel)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #17 TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 02/20/2019. Attorney Michael J. Weiss is admitted to participate in this action as counsel for defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Mays, Samuel)
February 20, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael J. Weiss (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2995025) by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of Illinois, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for the USDC for the Northern District of Illinois)(Weiss, Michael)
February 20, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David E. Heiss (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2995007) by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of Illinois, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for the USDC for the Northern District of Illinois)(Heiss, David)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: The following ddls/scheds were established: initial disclosures ddl 02/25/19; joining parties ddl 04/15/19; amended pleadings ddl 04/15/19; motions to dismiss ddl 05/13/19; expert disclosures due 09/05/19 for pltf, 10/07/19 for deft; written discovery ddl 10/07/19; depositions ddl 11/04/19; supplementation ddl 11/25/19; motions to exclude experts/daubert motions ddl 12/23/2019; all discovery ddl 11/04/19; mediation ddl 08/05/19; dispositive motions ddl 12/30/19; Non-Jury Trial set Monday, 04/20/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (4 days); Pretrial Conference set Friday, 04/10/2020 at 9:30 a.m.; Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due 04/03/2019. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 02/12/2019. (Mays, Samuel)
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER: Non-Jury Trial set for Monday, 4/20/2020 at 9:30 AM; Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 4/10/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/3/2020. (jam)
February 11, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTES: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 02/11/2019 before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. Attys John B. Phillip & Joseph B. Baker appeared on behalf of the pltf; Attys Peter E. Kanaris & Chris Vlahos appeared on behalf of the deft; proposed scheduling order was adopted. The following ddls/scheds were established: initial disclosures ddl 02/25/19; joining parties ddl 04/15/19; amended pleadings ddl 04/15/19; motions to dismiss ddl 05/13/19; expert disclosures due 09/05/19 for pltf, 10/07/19 for deft; written discovery ddl 10/07/19; depositions ddl 11/04/19; supplementation ddl 11/25/19; motions to exclude experts/daubert motions ddl 12/23/2019; all discovery ddl 11/04/19; mediation ddl 08/05/19; dispositive motions ddl 12/30/19; Non-Jury Trial set Monday, 04/20/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (4 days); Pretrial Conference set Friday, 04/10/2020 at 9:30 a.m.; Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due 04/03/2019. (Court Reporter: Nicole Warren) (jam)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph B. Baker on behalf of S.A. Hospitality Group, Inc. (Baker, Joseph)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #10 TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 02/08/2019. Attorney Peter E. Kanaris is admitted to participate in this action as counsel for defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Mays, Samuel)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Peter E. Kanaris (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2986565) by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of Illinois, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for the USDC for the Northern District of Illinois)(Kanaris, Peter)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna L Harris on behalf of Arch Specialty Insurance Company (Harris, Jenna)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set Monday, 02/11/2019 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (jl)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 Answer & Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by Arch Specialty Insurance Company.(Vlahos, Chris)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Vlahos, Chris)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Arch Specialty Insurance Company from Shelby County Chancery Court, case number CH-18-1694-3 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2961199), filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - TN State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Other State Court Filings)(Vlahos, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.A. Hospitality Group, Inc. v. Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.A. Hospitality Group, Inc.
Represented By: John B. Philip
Represented By: Joseph B. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Chris Vlahos
Represented By: David E. Heiss
Represented By: Michael J. Weiss
Represented By: Peter E Kanaris, I
Represented By: Jenna L. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Donna Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?