City of Memphis v. Beale Street Development Corporation

Plaintiff: City of Memphis
Defendant: Beale Street Development Corporation
In Re: Performa Entertainment Real Estate, Inc.
Undetermined: Kathleen Ford
Case Number: 2:2019cv02043
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT. Action dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 3/7/19. (des)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 3/7/19. (des)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal by City of Memphis. (Coury, Michael)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Exemption for Rule 26(a) and (f). Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 3/4/19. (drs)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION re #6 Setting Letter, To Be Exempt from Compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) and (f) by City of Memphis. (Coury, Michael)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Friday, 3/15/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 First MOTION Oral Argument OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW REFERENCE with E-Signature by Beale Street Development Corporation. (Parrish, Larry)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #3 First MOTION Oral Argument OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW REFERENCE filed by Beale Street Development Corporation has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Please review our Local Rule 11.1 concerning electronic signatures. Document should be resubmitted with electronic signature attached and under the event "Notice of Correction", allowing you to link filing to DE # 3. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 First MOTION Oral Argument OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW REFERENCE by Beale Street Development Corporation. (Parrish, Larry)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Transmittal to the United States District Court, Western District of Tennessee, of MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Beale Street Development Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Withdrawal of the Reference Pursuant to Title 28 U.S.C. 157(d), Filed on Dec. 10, 2018 as Docket Enter #24, #2 Order and Notice of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference of Adversary Proceeding, Filed Dec. 14, 2018 as Docket Entry #27, #3 Objection to Motion for Withdrawal of Reference, Filed Jan. 14, 2019, as Docket Entry #32, #4 Exhibit 1 Complaint for Injunctive Relief to Reforce Orders of the Court, #5 Exhibit 2 Settlement Agreement, #6 Exhibit 3 Consent Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, #7 Exhibit 4 Order Denying Motion to Set Aside Final Judgment and Related Pleadings, #8 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Memphis v. Beale Street Development Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Performa Entertainment Real Estate, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beale Street Development Corporation
Represented By: Larry E. Parrish
Represented By: Larry Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Kathleen Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Memphis
Represented By: Michael P. Coury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?