Brown v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Reginald A. Brown
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv02049
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reginald A. Brown. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 2/15/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. U.S. Attorney General served on 2/14/2019. U.S. Attorney served on 2/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Attorney General, #2 U.S. Attorney WDTN)(agj)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons, US 285 form, complaint and copy of Order #9 placed in US Marshall's inner office mail. (Attachments: #1 US Atty Gen, #2 US Attorney)(jae)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and ORDER to Issue and Effect Service of Process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 1/31/2019. (Pham, Tu)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Reginald A. Brown. (Jones, Ted)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Refile In Forma Pauperis Application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 1/28/2019. (Pham, Tu)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERENCE, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 01/23/2019. The APPLICATION #2 for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is referred to the magistrate judge for a determination. (Mays, Samuel)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Reginald A. Brown. (Jones, Ted)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill, filed by Reginald A. Brown.(Jones, Ted)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald A. Brown
Represented By: Ted I. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?