Reed v. Brewery Master Tenant, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: MARIO REED
Defendant: BREWERY MASTER TENANT, LLC, 495 TN PARTNERS, F/K/A 495 TENNESSEE, LLC and 495 TN Partners
Case Number: 2:2019cv02051
Filed: January 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
1 Judge: Samuel H Mays
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 495 TN Partners, Brewery Master Tenant, LLC identifying Corporate Parent 495 TN Partners for 495 TN Partners, Brewery Master Tenant, LLC.. (Kitay, Theresa)
March 18, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by 495 TN Partners, Brewery Master Tenant, LLC.(Kitay, Theresa)
March 18, 2019 Filing 24 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference RESET to Friday, 03/29/2019 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (Reset from 03/25/19) (jl)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF REFERENCE, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 03/08/2019. Plaintiff's MOTION #22 to Compel Inspection of Property is referred to the magistrate judge for a determination. (Mays, Samuel)
March 8, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Compel Inspection of Property proposed order submitted by Mario Reed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pltf's Request for Entry Upon Premises, #2 Exhibit B - Morgan v. Parc Plaza Magistrate Order)(Calhoun, Eric)
March 8, 2019 Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Calhoun, Eric)
March 7, 2019 Filing 20 SETTING LETTER: The Scheduling Conference is RESET to Monday, 03/25/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (Reset from 03/26/19) (jl)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #18 TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 03/07/2019. Attorney Theresa L. Kitay is admitted to participate in this action as counsel for Defendants Brewery Master Tenant, LLC, and 495 TN Partners, f/k/a 495 Tennessee, LLC. (Mays, Samuel)
March 5, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Theresa L. Kitay, proposed order submitted (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by 495 TN Partners, Brewery Master Tenant, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - NC Supreme Court, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - N.D. GA)(Kitay, Theresa)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING MOTION #16 TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 02/27/2019. Ms. Kitay may resubmit her motion after she has complied with the local rules. (Mays, Samuel)
February 27, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Theresa L. Kitay, proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3001332) by 495 TN Partners, Brewery Master Tenant, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kitay, Theresa)
February 26, 2019 Filing 15 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set Tuesday, 03/26/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (jl)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #13 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 02/15/2019. Defendants shall have until March 18, 2019 to file a responsive pleading. (Mays, Samuel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Amended Complaint (Unopposed) (Proposed Order Submitted) by All Defendants. (Giles, Shayna)
February 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Shayna Giles on behalf of All Defendants (Giles, Shayna)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #9 FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AND FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 02/05/2019. Attorney J. Luke Sanderson is substituted as co-counsel for plaintiff, and attorney Stephen F. Libby is withdrawn from further representation of plaintiff in this case. (Mays, Samuel)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by Mario Reed.(Calhoun, Eric)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Stephen F. Libby, MOTION to Substitute Attorney - J. Luke Sanderson by Mario Reed. (Calhoun, Eric)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to 495 TN Partners. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Brewery Master Tenant, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint, filed by Mario Reed has been filed. For future reference, please note: the style of the case has been edited to names not in all capital letters and the party, 495 TN Partners has been changed to reflect that the alias is not part of the name. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
January 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2970831), filed by MARIO REED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Brewery Master Tenant, LLC, #3 Summons - 495 TN Partners, f/k/a 495 Tennessee, LLC)(Calhoun, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Brewery Master Tenant, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BREWERY MASTER TENANT, LLC
Represented By: Theresa L. Kitay
Represented By: Shayna Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 495 TN PARTNERS, F/K/A 495 TENNESSEE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 495 TN Partners
Represented By: Theresa L. Kitay
Represented By: Shayna Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIO REED
Represented By: Eric G. Calhoun
Represented By: Jeffrey Lucas Sanderson
Represented By: Stephen F. Libby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?