Cousin v. Cash America Central, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Shirod Cousin
Defendant: First Cash, Inc. and Cash America Central, Inc
Undetermined: Edward L. Stanton, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02052
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:203
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 2/26/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Shirod Cousin. (Bailey, Laura Ann)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 3/13/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Cash America Central, Inc, First Cash, Inc..(Day, Frank)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by First Cash, Inc., Cash America Central, Inc from Shelby General Sessions, case number 1959891 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2971123), filed by First Cash, Inc., Cash America Central, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint - Civil Warrant, #2 Exhibit B: Notice to Shelby General Sessions of Filing Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Day, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cousin v. Cash America Central, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Cash, Inc.
Represented By: Frank L. Day, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cash America Central, Inc
Represented By: Frank L. Day, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirod Cousin
Represented By: Laura Ann Elizabeth Bailey
Represented By: Alan G. Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Edward L. Stanton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?