Thomas v. Tennison Brothers, Inc. et al

Appellee: Tennessee Dept. of Transportation, Tennison Brothers, Inc., Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc., Lynn Schadt Thomas and Acting U.S. Trustee Paul A. Randolph
Appellant: William H. Thomas, Jr.
Undetermined: Kathleen Ford
Case Number: 2:2019cv02065
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE from US Bankruptcy Court (Attachments: #1 12/18/18 transcript, #2 1/15/19 transcript)(jae)
February 26, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION for Reconsideration re #22 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Leave to File And Clarification of Cour's Order filed by Paul A. Randolph. (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
February 25, 2019 Filing 29 Appellant's BRIEF by William H. Thomas, Jr. Appellee Brief due by 3/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thomas, William)
February 21, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appellee Designation of Record to the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Appellee Acting United States Trustee Paul A. Randolph's Designation of Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal, #2 Appellee Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.'s Rule 8009(a)(2) Designation of No Additional Items to be Included in the Record.)(csf)
February 18, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION for Reconsideration re #22 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Leave to File And Clarification of Cour's Order proposed order submitted filed by Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.. (Spence, Robert)
February 15, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases No. 2:19-CV-02065 and No. 2:19-CV-02066 filed by Paul A. Randolph. (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
February 15, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by William H. Thomas, Jr re #22 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Leave to File Memorandum on Local Rule 7.2 Pursuant to Court's Order (Thomas, William)
February 13, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of (X) Appellant ( ) Appellee Designation of Record to the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation of Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues)(csf)
February 12, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Reconsideration re #22 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Leave to File And Clarification of Cour's Order by William H. Thomas, Jr. (Thomas, William)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING #6 EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY, GRANTING #13 MOTION TO STRIKE, STRIKING 19 ADDITIONAL REPLY SUA SPONTE AND IMPOSING SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 2/11/2019. (shl)
February 11, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tennison Brothers, Inc.. (Tennison, Kathy)
February 11, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc. re #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases No. 2:19-CV-02065 and No. 2:19-CV-02066 Notice of Joinder in the Response by Tennessee Department of Transportation in Opposition to Appellant's Motions to Consolidate Appeals (Spence, Robert)
February 8, 2019 Filing 18 ATTACHMENT to #17 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Tennessee Dept. of Transportation.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Thomas v. Copeland)(Willey, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Stay re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, Emergency Motion for Stay of Bankruptcy Court's Order Currently Under Appeal To This Court and Notice of Joinder in US Trustee's Response in Opposition to The Emergency Motion (ECF No. 15) filed by Tennessee Dept. of Transportation. (Willey, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases No. 2:19-CV-02065 and No. 2:19-CV-02066 filed by Tennessee Dept. of Transportation. (Willey, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Stay re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, Emergency Motion for Stay of Bankruptcy Court's Order Currently Under Appeal To This Court filed by Paul A. Randolph. (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
February 6, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Strike 9 Memorandum in Support of Motion, proposed order submitted filed by William H. Thomas, Jr. (Thomas, William)
February 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike 9 Memorandum in Support of Motion, proposed order submitted by Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.. (Spence, Robert)
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases No. 2:19-CV-02065 and No. 2:19-CV-02066 by William H. Thomas, Jr. (Thomas, William)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #5 JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 2/5/2019. (shl)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Stay re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, Emergency Motion for Stay of Bankruptcy Court's Order Currently Under Appeal To This Court and Notice of Joinder In Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.'s Response In Opposition filed by Tennison Brothers, Inc.. (Tennison, Kathy)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Willey on behalf of Tennessee Dept. of Transportation (Willey, Michael)
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Stay re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, Emergency Motion for Stay of Bankruptcy Court's Order Currently Under Appeal To This Court proposed order submitted filed by Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.. (Spence, Robert)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, Emergency Motion for Stay of Bankruptcy Court's Order Currently Under Appeal To This Court by William H. Thomas, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thomas, William)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline (proposed order submitted) by Paul A. Randolph. (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib on behalf of Paul A. Randolph (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING IN BANKRUPTCY APPEAL. Signed by Clerk on 1/24/2019. (csf)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-27850. File received, filed by William H. Thomas, Jr. Appellant Brief due by 2/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal from USBC, #2 Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Appointment of Chapter 11 Trustee, #3 Memorandum and Order on Renewed Motion, #4 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Tennison Brothers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Tennessee Dept. of Transportation
Represented By: Michael B. Willey
Represented By: Michael Willey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Tennison Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart B. Breakstone
Represented By: Kathy Baker Tennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L. J. Spence, Jr
Represented By: Kristina A. Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lynn Schadt Thomas
Represented By: Adam Michael Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Acting U.S. Trustee Paul A. Randolph
Represented By: Carrie Ann Rohrscheib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: William H. Thomas, Jr.
Represented By: William H. Thomas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Kathleen Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?