Smith v. Midland Credit Management, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Ida Smith
Defendant: John Does 1-25, Midland Funding LLC, Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Midland Funding, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02098
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 20 SETTING LETTER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/29/20; Pretrial Conference set to FRIDAY, 6/5/2020 at 9:30 AM; Jury Trial set to MONDAY, 6/15/20 at 9:30 AM before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (jam)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER :The Following Schedules and Deadlines were established: Joining Parties Deadline: 5/24/19 for PLT and 5/31/2019 for DFT; Amend Pleadings deadline: 5/24/19 for PLT and 5/31/19 for DFT; Rule 26 Expert deadline: 6/5/19 for PLT and 6/26/19 for DFT; Supplementation Deadline: 7/12/19; Interrogatories deadline: 7/26/19; Non-Class Expert deadline: 11/15/19 for PLT 12/6/2019 for DFT; Non-Class Supplementation: 12/20/19; Mediation Deadline: 1/21/20; Dispositive Motions deadline: 2/7/20. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order by 5/29/20. Pretrial Conference set to Friday, 6/5/20 at 9:30am. Jury Trial set to Monday, 6/15/20 at 9:30am and is estimated to take three (3-7) days. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 3/28/2019. (Mays, Samuel)
March 28, 2019 Filing 18 Minutes: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 3/28/19. Yaakov Saks (telephonically) appeared for the Plaintiff. Frank Springfield appeared (telephonically) for the Defense. The Following Schedules and Deadlines were established: Joining Parties Deadline: 5/24/19 for PLT and 5/31/2019 for DFT; Amend Pleadings deadline: 5/24/19 for PLT and 5/31/19 for DFT; Rule 26 Expert deadline: 6/5/19 for PLT and 6/26/19 for DFT; Supplementation Deadline: 7/12/19; Interrogatories deadline: 7/26/19; Non-Class Expert deadline: 11/15/19 for PLT 12/6/2019 for DFT; Non-Class Supplementation: 12/20/19; Mediation Deadline: 1/21/20; Dispositive Motions deadline: 2/7/20. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order by 5/29/20. Pretrial Conference set to Friday, 6/5/20 at 9:30am. Jury Trial set to Monday, 6/15/20 at 9:30am and is estimated to take three (3-7) days before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (Court Reporter: Nicole Warren) (jam)
March 27, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting AMENDED, SIGNED. (Saks, Yaakov)
March 27, 2019 Filing 16 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: There is no atttorney's s/signature. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld)
March 27, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Saks, Yaakov)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING SECOND MOTION #13 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 03/26/2019. Defendants shall have up to and including April 9, 2019 to file a responsive pleading. (Mays, Samuel)
March 26, 2019 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (UNOPPOSED) (Proposed Order Submitted) by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Springfield, Robert)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: The Scheduling Conference is RESET to 1:45 PM, Thursday, 03/28/2019, in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. **TIME CHANGE ONLY** (jl)
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set Thursday, 03/28/2019 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (jl)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #9 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 03/12/2019. Defendants shall have up to and including March 26, 2019 to file a responsive pleading. (Mays, Samuel)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Springfield, Robert)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ida Smith as to Midland Funding, LLC. (Saks, Yaakov)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ida Smith as to Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Saks, Yaakov)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(btg) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/8/2019) (btg). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/8/2019) (btg).
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (btg)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (btg)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (btg)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (btg)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-25, Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2986540), filed by Ida Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Saks, Yaakov)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Midland Credit Management, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Franklin Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Represented By: Robert Franklin Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ida Smith
Represented By: Yaakov Saks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?