Lewis v. Willis et al

Plaintiff: Nakinji Lewis
Defendant: Willie Lee Willis and Brown Trucking Company
Undetermined: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02099
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer - Proposed Order Submitted filed by Nakinji Lewis. (Fishman, Randall)
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #12 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer - Proposed Order Submitted filed by Willie Lee Willis has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: : Proposed order are not to be published on CM/ECF, but only emailed to chambers in word format. If no order previously emailed, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. (jae)
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer - Proposed Order Submitted by Willie Lee Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Willis, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Amended Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Porposed Order)(Matthews, Zach)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand Memo of Law in Support of Motion to Remand, #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Mr. Willis, #2 Exhibit B - E-mail String, #3 Exhibit C - E-mail String)(Matthews, Zach)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand Memo of Law in Support of Motion to Remand by Nakinji Lewis. (Fishman, Randall)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Nakinji Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Police accident report, #3 Exhibit Return of Summons-Brown Trucking, #4 Exhibit TN Sec of State Affidavit, #5 Exhibit Brown Trucking Answer State Court, #6 Exhibit Whalen v. Dollar General)(Fishman, Randall)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall J. Fishman on behalf of Nakinji Lewis (Fishman, Randall)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant Willie Lee Willis ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Willie Lee Willis.(Matthews, Zach)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Brown Trucking Company, Willie Lee Willis has been filed. For future reference, please note: Civil cover sheet has a "wet signature". All documents submitted by counsel must contain electronic signature.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Brown Trucking Company, Willie Lee Willis from Circuit Ct of TN 30th Jud District, case number CT-004241-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2986563), filed by Brown Trucking Company, Willie Lee Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Ack of Service, #4 Exhibit D - Citizenship, #5 Exhibit E - Return of Service of Summons Brown Trucking, #6 Exhibit F - Brown Trucking Motion to Open Default, #7 Exhibit G - Return of Non-Service - Willis, #8 Exhibit H - Plaintiff 1st ROGs & RPDs to Brown Trucking, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Matthews, Zach)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Willis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Lee Willis
Represented By: Zach M. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown Trucking Company
Represented By: Zach M. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nakinji Lewis
Represented By: Randall J. Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?