Skinner v. United States of America

Petitioner: Frank Skinner
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv02100
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Mark S Norris
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE from the United States Court of Appeals: Copy of District Court Order filed to transfer proceedings to Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals. (csf)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE from United States Court of Appeals: Second Successive Motion transferred from District Court. Notice filed by Movant Frank Skinner. 2nd/Successive Motion Received in 6CA: 02/13/2019. (csf)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING SUCCESSIVE 2255 MOTION TO SIXTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 2/12/19. (Norris, Mark)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lorraine Craig on behalf of United States of America (Craig, Lorraine)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255 filed by Frank Skinner against United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skinner v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frank Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: 2255 AUSA
Represented By: Lorraine Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?