Rosse v. United States of America

Petitioner: Samuel Rosse
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv02113
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Samuel Rosse. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #1 2255 Motion. Response due by 4/25/2019. Reply due by 5/23/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 04/03/2019. (Fowlkes, J.)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Pro Se Complaint, w/ proposed order submitted by United States of America. (Erskine, Mark)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 02/28/2019. (Fowlkes, J.)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Correction to #5 Notice of Appearance . (Erskine, Mark)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Alan Erskine on behalf of United States of America (Erskine, Mark)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry R. Kitchen on behalf of United States of America (Kitchen, Jerry)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing United States to respond to #1 2255 Motion. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 02/28/2019. (Fowlkes, J.)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence filed by Samuel Rosse against United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter requesting 2255 for both cases 12-20229 and 14-20011, #2 Envelope, #3 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosse v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: 2255 AUSA
Represented By: Jerry R. Kitchen
Represented By: Mark Alan Erskine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samuel Rosse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?