Bishop v. LG Electronics USA, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: David Bishop
Defendant: VGOD, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc. and New Age Investments of Cordova, LLC
Undetermined: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02127
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS #40 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 4/19/19. (shl)
April 18, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant LG's Motion to Dismiss - proposed order submitted by David Bishop. (Brose, David)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 4/17/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 4/17/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
April 17, 2019 Filing 37 ATTACHMENT GA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing to #33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3042433) by LG Electronics USA, Inc... (Freed, Philip)
April 17, 2019 Filing 36 ATTACHMENT GA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing to #34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3042506) by LG Electronics USA, Inc... (Strong, Marcus)
April 17, 2019 Filing 35 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3042433) filed by LG Electronics USA, Inc., #34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3042506) filed by LG Electronics USA, Inc. has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Neither motion has the required TWO certificates of good standing. Please see LR 83.4(c). Filer should submit their second certificate of good standing as an "Attachment", linking the filing to their motion. By filing as an attachment instead of another motion, you won't be asked to pay the phv fee again, or have to bypass that payment screen. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae)
April 16, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3042506) by LG Electronics USA, Inc.. (Strong, Marcus)
April 16, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3042433) by LG Electronics USA, Inc.. (Freed, Philip)
April 2, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE by New Age Investments of Cordova, LLC Of Agreement To A Mediator, pursuant to Scheduling Order (McLean, Albert)
March 29, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE by LG Electronics USA, Inc. Notice of Service (Rieder, William)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 3/26/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
March 26, 2019 Filing 29 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Monday, 6/15/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 6/5/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/29/2020. (tlh)
March 26, 2019 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference held on 3/26/2019. David Allen Brose & Connor Glen Curran appearing by telephone for the Plaintiff. William Jackson Rieder appearing by telephone for defendant LG Electronics USA, Inc.; Michael James Petherick appearing by telephone for defendant VGOD, Inc.; Patrick Lowther appearing by telephone & Albert G. McLean appearing in person for defendant New Age Investments of Cordova, LLC. Dates/deadlines established: Jury Trial set for Monday, 6/15/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 6/5/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/29/2020. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey)(1:00-1:24) (tlh)
March 26, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Connor Glen Curran on behalf of David Bishop (Curran, Connor)
March 22, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by David Bishop of Service (Brose, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by LG Electronics USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Carolyn McNerney)(Rieder, William)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 3/21/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
March 20, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by William Jackson Rieder on behalf of LG Electronics USA, Inc. (Rieder, William)
March 20, 2019 Filing 22 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Patrick L. Lowther (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3019704) filed by New Age Investments of Cordova, LLC has been filed. For future reference, please note: Proposed order should not be published to CM/ECF, but only emailed to chambers in word format. If no order previously emailed, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
March 20, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Patrick L. Lowther (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3019704) by New Age Investments of Cordova, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Consultation)(Lowther, Patrick)
March 19, 2019 Filing 20 Proposed Pretrial Order Proposed Joint Scheduling Order by David Bishop. (Brose, David)
March 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael James Petherick on behalf of VGOD, Inc. (Petherick, Michael)
March 19, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Brose, David)
March 19, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Bishop as to VGOD, Inc.. (Yasinsky, Jason)
March 19, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Bishop as to LG Electronics USA, Inc.. (Yasinsky, Jason)
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by LG Electronics USA, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent To Removal (Albritton, Barret)
March 1, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by VGOD, Inc..(Martin, Sean)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Defendant LG Electronics USA, Inc. must file an Answer or other responsive pleading by or before 3/21/2019. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 3/1/2019. (shl)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer To Amended Complaint by LG Electronics USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreed Order on Extension of Time)(Albritton, Barret)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Barret Shane Albritton on behalf of LG Electronics USA, Inc. (Albritton, Barret)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean William Martin on behalf of VGOD, Inc. (Martin, Sean)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by New Age Investments of Cordova, LLC.(McLean, Albert)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David Allen Brose on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brose, David)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 3/26/2019 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by New Age Investments of Cordova, LLC has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: No electronic signature on civil cover sheet. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer is not required to resubmit document. (btg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (btg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (btg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (btg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (btg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New Age Investments of Cordova, LLC from Shelby Circuit, case number CT-004748-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2997071), filed by New Age Investments of Cordova, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(McLean, Albert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishop v. LG Electronics USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGOD, Inc.
Represented By: Sean William Martin
Represented By: Michael James Petherick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics USA, Inc.
Represented By: Philip Michael Freed
Represented By: William Jackson Rieder
Represented By: Marcus Strong
Represented By: Barret Shane Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Age Investments of Cordova, LLC
Represented By: Albert G. McLean
Represented By: Patrick Lowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bishop
Represented By: David W. Hill
Represented By: Connor Glen Curran
Represented By: David Allen Brose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?