Pilgram v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.

Plaintiff: Renata Pilgram
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Undetermined: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02130
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING NOTICE AND STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 4/23/19. (des)
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. Service of Defendants First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production to Plaintiff Renata Pilgram (Frulla, William)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial is set for Monday, 4/6/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 3/27/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 on 3/20/2020. (jrs)
March 21, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 3/21/2019. Allen Morgan Gressett appeared for the Plaintiff. William Christopher Frulla appeared for the Defendant. Jury Trial is set for Monday, 4/6/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Trial is estimated to last 2-3 days. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 3/27/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 on 3/20/2020. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Sheryl Weatherford, Alpha Reporting) (jrs)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 3/21/19. (des)
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. Service of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Frulla, William)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Frulla, William)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Renata Pilgram of Serving Initial Rule 26 Disclosures (Gressett, Allen)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Thursday, 3/21/2019 at 3:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. for Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P... (Frulla, William)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P..(Frulla, William)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-041-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2999456), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frulla, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pilgram v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: William Christopher Frulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renata Pilgram
Represented By: Allen Morgan Gressett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?