Alliance Laundry Systems LLC v. Rodney Eugene Martin d/b/a Renee's Laundry House
Plaintiff: Alliance Laundry Systems LLC
Defendant: Rodney Eugene Martin d/b/a Renee's Laundry House, Rodney Eugene Martin and Rodney Eugene Martin doing business as Renee's Laundry House
Case Number: 2:2019cv02141
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: John T Fowlkes
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Filing 15 JUDGMENT signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 3/4/2022. (Fowlkes, J.)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Default Judgment signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 2/10/2020. (Fowlkes, J.)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment [proposed order submitted] by Alliance Laundry Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Decl. of Ryan A. Burgett, #2 Exhibit B- Affidavit of Steven Michels, #3 [proposed] Order)(Burgett, Ryan)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract and Breach of Guaranty against Rodney Eugene Martin, filed by Alliance Laundry Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Note, #2 Exhibit B-Guaranty, #3 Exhibit C-Notice of Default, #4 Exhibit D-Final Demand, #5 Exhibit E-Security Agreement, #6 Exhibit F- Alliance's UCC Filing, #7 Exhibit G-Consent to Repossession, #8 Exhibit H-Private Sale of Collateral on Default) (Burgett, Ryan)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting DE #10 Motion to Amend/Correct signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 6/25/19. (Fowlkes, John)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, (proposed order submitted) by Alliance Laundry Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Burgett, Ryan)
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Rodney Eugene Martin. Motion terminated: #8 MOTION for Entry of Default (Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendants) filed by Alliance Laundry Systems LLC. (jld)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default (Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendants) by Alliance Laundry Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Request for Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit Proposed Clerk's Entry of Default)(Burgett, Ryan)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Rodney Eugene Martin on 03/29/2019, filed by Alliance Laundry Systems LLC. (Burgett, Ryan)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Rodney Eugene Martin d/b/a Renee's Laundry House. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (btg)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (btg)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (btg)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (btg)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (btg)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rodney Eugene Martin d/b/a Renee's Laundry House (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3004394), filed by Alliance Laundry Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons)(Burgett, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alliance Laundry Systems LLC v. Rodney Eugene Martin d/b/a Renee's Laundry House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Eugene Martin d/b/a Renee's Laundry House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Eugene Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Eugene Martin doing business as Renee's Laundry House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliance Laundry Systems LLC
Represented By: Ryan Allen Burgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?