Hogan v. Frontier Airlines, Inc.

Plaintiff: Ricky Hogan
Defendant: Frontier Airlines, Inc.
Undetermined: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02144
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER: [TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED] Status Conference set for 8/23/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. (wrh)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON MEDIATION. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 04/17/2019. (Fowlkes, John)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/23/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. ADR deadline is 7/19/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 5/13/2019. Discovery due by 9/4/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 5/13/2019. Motions due by 10/4/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 04/17/2019. (Fowlkes, John)
April 17, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 4/17/2019. Both Parties present in Court. Parties updated the Court as to the status of the case. Plaintiff will provide written discovery within the next week. The Court accepts the proposed scheduling order advancing the proposed mediation deadline to Friday, July 19, 2019, orders to be entered. Case set Friday, 08/23/2019 at 9:00 a.m. for Status Conference. (Plaintiff: S. Scott Taylor)(Defense: Michael Keith Radford) (Court Reporter Mark Dodson.) (wrh)
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Keith Radford on behalf of Frontier Airlines, Inc. (Radford, Michael)
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2019 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis, before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes scheduling guidelines at https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager. (pyb)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Frontier Airlines, Inc.. (Crawley, Timothy)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Frontier Airlines, Inc..(Crawley, Timothy)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Frontier Airlines, Inc. has been filed. For future reference, please note "Wet Signature" on the civil cover sheet. Please see ECF Policies and Procedures 10.1 Electronic Signature.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Frontier Airlines, Inc. from Circuit Court of Shelby County Tennessee, case number CT-0257-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3006067), filed by Frontier Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Crawley, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogan v. Frontier Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Hogan
Represented By: S. Scott Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Crawley
Represented By: Michael Keith Radford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?