Thomas v. WALMART STORES, EAST, L.P.

Plaintiff: Carla Thomas
Defendant: WALMART STORES, EAST, L.P.
Not Yet Classified: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02188
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by WALMART STORES, EAST, L.P. Defendant's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Wilson, Keely)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 4/25/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
April 25, 2019 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Monday, 4/27/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 4/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/10/2020. (jpw)
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference held on 4/25/2019. Irwin Cantor appeared for the Plaintiff. Keely Wilson appeared for the Defense. This case could be possibly remanded back to State Court. Jury Trial set for Monday, 4/27/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. *Trial is estimated to last 2 days. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 4/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/10/2020. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey) (jpw) *Modified on 4/25/2019 (jpw).
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by WALMART STORES, EAST, L.P. of Serving Interr/RFP to Plaintiff (Wilson, Keely)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by WALMART STORES, EAST, L.P..(Wilson, Keely)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Wilson, Keely)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, 4/25/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh)
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART STORES, EAST, L.P.. (Wilson, Keely)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART STORES, EAST, L.P. from Circuit Court of Shelby County, Tennessee, case number CT-0801-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3022446), filed by WALMART STORES, EAST, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, Keely)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. WALMART STORES, EAST, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Thomas
Represented By: Irwin I. Cantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART STORES, EAST, L.P.
Represented By: Keely N. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?