Smith v. American Water Resources of Tennessee et al
Plaintiff: Charmane Smith
Defendant: Memphis Light Gas and Water and American Water Resources of Tennessee
Case Number: 2:2019cv02275
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Parker
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf)
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00388. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/30/2019: #2 Judicial Cards) (csf).
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to Western District of Tennessee. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/29/2019. (jdh) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/30/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (rah) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/30/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense by Charmane Smith. (rah) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/30/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #4 by Charmane Smith. (rah) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/30/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 4/26/2019. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/9/2019. (jdh) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/30/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charmane Smith. (rah) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/30/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against American Water Resources of Tennessee, and Memphis Light, Gas, and Water, filed by Charmane Smith.(rah) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/30/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-cv-388-JPG-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to the pro se litigant guide, found on the ILSD website, for further information. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Brochure)(rah) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. American Water Resources of Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memphis Light Gas and Water
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Water Resources of Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charmane Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?