Davis v. United States of America

Petitioner: Harold Davis
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv02286
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Harold Davis informing the court that he is no longer at FCI Gilmer but is in transit. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jld)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #7 FOR ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 06/03/2019. AUSA Kasey A. Weiland is substituted as counsel for the United States in this action and AUSA Debra Lynn Ireland is withdrawn. (Mays, Samuel)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #8 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND to movant's motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 06/03/2019. Respondent shall have until July 5, 2019 to file a responsive pleading. (Mays, Samuel)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Order proposed order submitted by United States of America. (Weiland, Kasey)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Substitute Attorney proposed order submitted by United States of America. (Weiland, Kasey)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kasey Weiland on behalf of United States of America (Weiland, Kasey)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE "Change of Address" no longer at FCI Gilmer being moved to another prison but has not been told which one yet. Will let the court know when he is moved by Harold Davis (jld)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING UNITED STATES TO RESPOND, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 05/06/2019. (Mays, Samuel)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra Lynn Ireland on behalf of United States of America (Ireland, Debra)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence filed by Harold Davis against United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Envelope, #3 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Debra Lynn Ireland
Represented By: 2255 AUSA
Represented By: Kasey Weiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?