Allen v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Kimberly Allen
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Not Yet Classified: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02324
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Kimberly Allen Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Downey, Kristen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Kimberly Allen of Service of Plaintiff's Answers to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production (Downey, Kristen)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 6/20/19. (des)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Monday, 3/23/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 3/13/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4:30 PM on 3/6/2020. (jrs)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Scheduling Conference held on 6/19/2019. Kristen Joy Downey appeared for the Plaintiff. William Christopher Frulla appeared for the Defendant. Jury Trial set for Monday, 3/23/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Trial estimated to last 2-3 days. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 3/13/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4:30 PM on 3/6/2020. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Valerie Hall-Gilliam, Alpa Reporting) (jrs)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Frulla, William)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP Service of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Doucuments (Frulla, William)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Wednesday, 6/19/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.. (Frulla, William)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (jae)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-1406-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3072407), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Frulla, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: William Christopher Frulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Allen
Represented By: Jennifer L. Miller
Represented By: Kristen Joy Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?