Turner v. Dunning et al
Plaintiff: Leberal C. Turner
Defendant: Andrew Proffer, BNSF Railway Company and Justin Dunning
Not Yet Classified: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02367
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 7/8/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Leberal C. Turner. (Chen, Lan)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Andrew Proffer.(Wheeler, John)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Justin Dunning.(Wheeler, John)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by BNSF Railway Company.(Wheeler, John)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Sams Gratz on behalf of BNSF Railway Company, Justin Dunning, Andrew Proffer (Gratz, Margaret)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, 7/11/2019 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (jpw)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 INDEX OF STATE COURT RECORD by BNSF Railway Company, Justin Dunning, Andrew Proffer. (Wheeler, John)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (jae)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BNSF Railway Company, Andrew Proffer, Justin Dunning from Shelby Circuit, case number CT-2021-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3084863), filed by BNSF Railway Company, Andrew Proffer, Justin Dunning. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Justin Dunning, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Andrew Proffer, #4 Exhibit 3 - Summons and Complaint)(Wheeler, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Dunning et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Proffer
Represented By: John G. Wheeler
Represented By: Margaret Sams Gratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: John G. Wheeler
Represented By: Margaret Sams Gratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Dunning
Represented By: John G. Wheeler
Represented By: Margaret Sams Gratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leberal C. Turner
Represented By: Brittany Neal
Represented By: Garth Carson
Represented By: Eric Joseph Lewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?