Douglas v. Regions Bank
Plaintiff: Chamel Douglas
Defendant: Regions Bank
Case Number: 2:2019cv02379
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Regions Bank Notice of Service of Defendant Regions Bank's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Tom, Robert)
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Regions Bank Joint Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan (Kisber, Zachary)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 ATTACHMENT Affidavit of Kimberly Townsley to #7 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Jury Demand by Regions Bank.. (Kisber, Zachary)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Chamel Douglas re #7 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Jury Demand of Non-Objection to Motion (Kerney, Frank)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis, before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes scheduling guidelines at https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager. (pyb) Modified on 7/10/2019 (Fowlkes, John).
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant Regions Bank's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff Chamel Douglas' Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Regions Bank.(Tom, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chamel Douglas as to Regions Bank. (Kerney, Frank)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary A. Kisber on behalf of Regions Bank (Kisber, Zachary)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Jury Demand by Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Kimberly Townsley)(Tom, Robert) Affadavit sealed on 7/25/2019 because it contains personal identifiers. Filer to re-file redacted copy (cbs).
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Regions Bank. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Regions Bank (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3088631), filed by Chamel Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kerney, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas v. Regions Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chamel Douglas
Represented By: Frank H. Kerney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank
Represented By: Robert F. Tom
Represented By: Zachary A. Kisber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?