Calvin v. Winchester Bowl, LLC
Plaintiff: Chelsea Calvin
Defendant: Winchester Bowl, LLC
Not Yet Classified: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02383
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Lundy Daniel on behalf of Chelsea Calvin (Daniel, Benjamin)
July 16, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Winchester Bowl, LLC of Rule 45(a)(4) Document Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served Subpoena on Memphis Police Dept.and City of Memphis, TN)(Shepherd, Charles)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING #16 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF AND DENYING AS MOOT #13 JOINT MOTION CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 7/15/2019. (shl)
July 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: The Status Conference/Motion Hearing set TODAY, Thursday, 7/11/2019 at 1:00 PM IS CANCELLED. (jpw)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - proposed order submitted by Chelsea Calvin. (Saharovich, Ryan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #13 Joint MOTION to Continue Fed. R. 16(b) Scheduling Conference filed by Winchester Bowl, LLC has been filed. For future reference, please note: Filer failed to indicate in docket text "Proposed Order Submitted". Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER. The Court will hold a status conference on Thursday, 7/11/2019 at 1:00 PM to address #13 Joint Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 7/9/2019. (Lipman, Sheryl)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Continue Fed. R. 16(b) Scheduling Conference by Winchester Bowl, LLC. (Shepherd, Charles)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Winchester Bowl, LLC of Service of Discovery Documents (Shepherd, Charles)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Joint). (Shepherd, Charles)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Winchester Bowl, LLC.(Shepherd, Charles)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Winchester Bowl, LLC.(Shepherd, Charles)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, July 11, 219 at 1:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Winchester Bowl, LLC to Adverse Party of Removal and Certification of Notice to State Court Clerk (Shepherd, Charles)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Winchester Bowl, LLC. (Shepherd, Charles)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (jae)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Winchester Bowl, LLC d/b/a Winchester Bowl from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-1385-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3089390), filed by Winchester Bowl, LLC d/b/a Winchester Bowl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Shelby County Circuit Summons-Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shepherd, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calvin v. Winchester Bowl, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winchester Bowl, LLC
Represented By: Charles Gavin Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Calvin
Represented By: Ryan Saharovich
Represented By: Les Jones
Represented By: Benjamin Lundy Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?