Park v. Kim et al
Plaintiff: Minwoo Park
Defendant: Jeong Hee Kim, VP-1, Inc. d/b/a Value Penny, Chol Woo Kim and VP-1,Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02402
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Proposed Order Submitted by All Defendants. (Conway, Kannon)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants answers due 8/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 8/2/2019. Note: text only, no image associated with entry. (ars)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by All Defendants. (Jewel, Gary)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L Jewel on behalf of All Defendants (Jewel, Gary)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Preston Battle, IV on behalf of Minwoo Park (Battle, Walter)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minwoo Park as to VP-1,Inc.. (Patterson, Lori)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minwoo Park as to Jeong Hee Kim. (Patterson, Lori)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minwoo Park as to Chol Woo Kim. (Patterson, Lori)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to VP-1,Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Chol Woo Kim. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jeong Hee Kim. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (jld)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3097870), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons)(Patterson, Lori)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Park v. Kim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeong Hee Kim
Represented By: Gary L Jewel
Represented By: Kannon C. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VP-1, Inc. d/b/a Value Penny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chol Woo Kim
Represented By: Gary L Jewel
Represented By: Kannon C. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VP-1,Inc.
Represented By: Gary L Jewel
Represented By: Kannon C. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minwoo Park
Represented By: Lori Hackleman Patterson
Represented By: Walter Preston Battle, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?