Persinger v. A Gentle Touch Home Care, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Casey Persinger
Defendant: A Gentle Touch Home Care, Inc. and Sondra Stevenson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02421
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically Unopposed, proposed order submitted by Casey Persinger. (Ventura, Chanelle)
August 29, 2019 Filing 22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Proposed Order Submitted. (Madison, Chandra)
August 29, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference Scheduled for September 5, 2019 (proposed order submitted) by All Plaintiffs. (Ventura, Chanelle)
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE RE-SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE **CHANGE IN TIME ONLY** (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY): The parties are hereby notified that the Scheduling Conference currently set for Thursday, September 5, 2019 at 11:30 AM has been reset to Thursday, September 5, 2019 at 10:30 A.M. (CST) in Courtroom 1- Memphis, before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (CHANGE IN TIME ONLY). (smm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Chanelle Joy Ventura on behalf of Casey Persinger (Ventura, Chanelle)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #16 MOTION TO WITHDRAW. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/26/2019. (shl)
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Casey Persinger has been filed. For future reference, please note: Filer failed to indicate "proposed order submitted" in docket text. If no order previously emailed to chambers, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Casey Persinger. (Espy, Christopher)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #12 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING OR RULE 12 MOTION. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/12/2019. (shl)
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodrick D. Holmes on behalf of A Gentle Touch Home Care, Inc., Sondra Stevenson (Holmes, Rodrick)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, September 5, 2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading or Rule 12 Motion w/ proposed order submitted by A Gentle Touch Home Care, Inc., Sondra Stevenson. (Madison, Chandra)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A Gentle Touch Home Care, Inc.. (Madison, Chandra)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Chandra Simone Madison on behalf of All Defendants (Madison, Chandra)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casey Persinger as to Sondra Stevenson. (Espy, Christopher)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casey Persinger as to A Gentle Touch Home Care, Inc.. (Espy, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sondra Stevenson. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to A Gentle Touch Home Care, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A Gentle Touch Home Care, Inc., Sondra Stevenson (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3105828), filed by Casey Persinger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons on A Gentle Touch Home Care, Inc., #3 Summons on Sondra Stevenson)(Espy, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Persinger v. A Gentle Touch Home Care, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Gentle Touch Home Care, Inc.
Represented By: Rodrick D. Holmes
Represented By: Chandra Simone Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sondra Stevenson
Represented By: Rodrick D. Holmes
Represented By: Chandra Simone Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Persinger
Represented By: Christopher W. Espy
Represented By: Chanelle Joy Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?