Peters et al v. Red Robin International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Susan Peters and Kirk Peters
Defendant: Red Robin International, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02477
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Mark S Norris
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 ATTACHMENT Standard Track Scheduling Order to #13 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Red Robin International, Inc... (Malone, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Malone, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #9 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 09/24/19. (Norris, Mark)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3171234) Certificate of Good Standing by Joel Andrew Palmer on behalf of Red Robin International, Inc. (Palmer, Joel)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3171234) filed by Red Robin International, Inc. has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Local Rule 83.4 states that attorneys applying for admission phv must submit TWO certificates of good standing. One from the highest court in which you are admitted and one from a district court. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3171234) by Red Robin International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Palmer, Joel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 09/27/2019 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant Red Robin International, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Red Robin International, Inc..(Malone, Michael)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Red Robin International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Red Robin Gourmet Burgers, Inc. for Red Robin International, Inc... (Malone, Michael)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Red Robin International, Inc. from Circuit Crt of TN, 13th Judicial District at Memphis, case number CT-2662-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3124528), filed by Red Robin International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Malone, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peters et al v. Red Robin International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Peters
Represented By: Bobby F. Martin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Peters
Represented By: Bobby F. Martin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Robin International, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Anthony Malone
Represented By: Joel Andrew Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?