Melvin, et al v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Courtney Paige Melvin and Amanda Taylor Melvin
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Not Yet Classified: Donna L. Russell
Case Number: 2:2019cv02512
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
2 Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #21 Motion to Stay Pending Settlement. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/04/2019. (mm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 21 Consent MOTION to Stay Pending Settlement (proposed order submitted) by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Spore, Caroline)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #19 Motion to Extend Deadline to Submit Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 09/18/2019. (mom)
September 18, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Extend Deadline to Submit Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures (proposed order submitted) by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Spore, Caroline)
September 13, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.. (Spore, Caroline)
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Spore, Caroline)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on September 13, 2019. (mom)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Spore, Caroline)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER: The Non-Jury Trial is set for Monday, 6/22/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 6/12/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by noon on 6/5/2020. (jrs)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/6/2019. Edward M. Bearman and Genevieve Sabotnik Land appeared for the Plaintiff. Caroline Dare Spore appeared for the Defendant. Non-Jury Trial is set for Monday, 6/22/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Non-jury trial is estimated to last 1 day. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 6/12/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 6/5/2020. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Polly Wardlaw) (jrs)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 9/6/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. See attached instructions. (jpw)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint and Resetting Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on August 14, 2019. (des)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla added. Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr no longer assigned to case. (jld)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.. (Spore, Caroline)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer proposed order submitted by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Spore, Caroline)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set Wednesday, 09/04/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (jl)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund Scott Sauer on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Sauer, Edmund)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company from Shelby County Chancery, case number CH-19-0933 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3133800), filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spore, Caroline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melvin, et al v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Paige Melvin
Represented By: Gary E. Veazey
Represented By: Edward M. Bearman
Represented By: Genevieve Sabotnik Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Taylor Melvin
Represented By: Gary E. Veazey
Represented By: Edward M. Bearman
Represented By: Genevieve Sabotnik Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Donna L. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Caroline Dare Spore
Represented By: Edmund Scott Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?