Republic Roofing & Restoration, LLC et al v. National Security Fire & Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Annie Chandler and Republic Roofing & Restoration, LLC
Defendant: National Security Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02518
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by National Security Fire & Casualty Company.(Bay, R.)
October 1, 2019 Filing 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Kimerling, Whitney)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 9/6/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
September 6, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3161068) by Annie Chandler, Republic Roofing & Restoration, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Admissions, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing from MN Supreme Court, #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing from USDC Minnesota)(Snodgrass, Thomas)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD #19 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 09/04/2019. (shl)
August 30, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer proposed order submitted by National Security Fire & Casualty Company. (Kimerling, Whitney)
August 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Dale Bay on behalf of National Security Fire & Casualty Company (Bay, R.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 17 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, October 8, 2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/30/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W. Vescovo on behalf of National Security Fire & Casualty Company (Vescovo, Stephen)
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitney Henry Kimerling on behalf of National Security Fire & Casualty Company (Kimerling, Whitney)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Republic Roofing & Restoration, LLC as to National Security Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certified Mail Return Receipt)(McWherter, James)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #11 Notice of Correction, has been filed.There is not an indication that a proposed order was sent to the judge's chambers. If one has not been e-mailed please do so. The order needs to be in word format. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. (jld)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Correction to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3135448) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - Certification fr Sup. Court of KY, #4 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Peterson, Erik)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3135448) filed by Annie Chandler has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Motion to appear PHV must be accompanied by TWO certificates of good standing. Please review Local Rule 83.4 (d). Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3135448) by Annie Chandler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Peterson, Erik)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily S. Alcorn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Alcorn, Emily)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan L. Bobbitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bobbitt, Jonathan)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to National Security Fire & Casualty Company. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Security Fire & Casualty Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3134629), filed by Republic Roofing & Restoration, LLC, Annie Chandler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(McWherter, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Republic Roofing & Restoration, LLC et al v. National Security Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Chandler
Represented By: James Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Erik D. Peterson
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Represented By: Jonathan L. Bobbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republic Roofing & Restoration, LLC
Represented By: James Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Represented By: Jonathan L. Bobbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Security Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: R. Dale Bay
Represented By: Stephen W. Vescovo
Represented By: Whitney Henry Kimerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?