Mitchum v. Saul
Plaintiff: Kenneth Nathaniel Mitchum
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv02533
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to The Attorney General of the United States. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jld)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 OBJECTION by Kenneth Nathaniel Mitchum re 4 Notice LR 16.2. Party wants his case assigned to the Standard Track. (jae)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The filer presented summonses to Clerk's Office which issued the summons and returned to the filer in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons as to Attorney General of the United States)(csf)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 Current Medical Record of Kenneth Nathaniel Mitchum by Kenneth Nathaniel Mitchum (csf)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 A Statement of Claim and Service of Process Affidavit by Kenneth Nathaniel Mitchum (csf)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 ATTACHMENT to #1 Pro Se Complaint, JS44 Civil Civil Cover Sheet by Kenneth Nathaniel Mitchum.. (csf)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issuance of summonses as to all Defendant's and summonses returned to filer in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Attorney's Office, #2 Attorney General of the United States)(csf)
August 14, 2019 Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters. Pursuant to Local Rule 4.1(b)(1), the plaintiff shall present the Clerk with a properly completed summons for each defendant, and the Clerk shall issue the summons(es) to the plaintiff for service on the defendant(s). (csf)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE: Declined agreement to receive notice of electronic filing (NEF) by Kenneth Nathaniel Mitchum (csf)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Case initiation fee: PAID $ 400.00, receipt number M4676043126 (csf)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE for Review of Social Security Disability or Supplemental Security Income Decision filed by Kenneth Nathaniel Mitchum against Andrew M. Saul. (Attachments: #1 Error of Law, #2 Exhibits, #3 Notice of Appeals Council Action, #4 Order of Appeals Council, #5 Identification, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchum v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Nathaniel Mitchum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?