Barnes v. United States of America
Petitioner: Darnell Barnes
Respondent: United States of America and Warden Angela Owens
Case Number: 2:2019cv02536
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Parker
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of returned certified receipt #9590 9402 3890 860 2391 50. (jld)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Angela Owens, United States of America Notice Regarding Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Howard Williams)(Kuo, Eileen)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of returned certified receipt #9590 9402 3890 8060 2391 67 by Angela Owens (jld)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to Modify the Docket and Directing Respondent to Respond to Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2241. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 09/12/2019. (kah)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Darnell Barnes (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jld)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 Case initiation fee: PAID $ 5.00, receipt number M4676043253 (csf)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 Pro Se NOTICE by Darnell Barnes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(jld)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Petitioner to File In Forma Pauperis Affidavit or Pay the Habeas Filing Fee. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 8/22/2019. (pab)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Darnell Barnes (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jld)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR REVIEW IN RE: FIRST STEP ACT (csf)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Letter from Clerk VAED explaining the transfer of the motion. (Attachments: #1 Order of Transfer signed by Judge Robert G. Dourmar (VAED), #2 VAED Criminal Docket Sheet case 4:10-cr-00074, #3 VAED United States' Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Good Time Credit Under The First Step Act of 2018) (csf)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE Motion Under First Step Act Construed by Transferring Court (VAED) as Petition Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by Darnell Barnes against United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope from Barnes to Eastern District of Virginia, #3 Envelope from VAED to TNWD, #4 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: 2241 AUSA - Memphis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Angela Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darnell Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?