Schaffer v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chris Schaffer
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Memphis Light, Gas and Water and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02552
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/16/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
October 16, 2019 Filing 25 SETTING LETTER with PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: Jury Trial set for Tuesday, September 29, 2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Steptember 11, 2020. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, September 18, 2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
October 16, 2019 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference was held on 10/16/2019. On the phone were Frank H. Kerney, III for the plaintiff and Brian L. Yoakum for the defendant(s). Randall D. Noel appeared for the defendant(s). Jury Trial set for Tuesday, September 29, 2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Steptember 11, 2020. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, September 18, 2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (Court Reporter Candace Covey.) (smm)
October 15, 2019 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Trans Union LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
October 14, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Memphis Light, Gas and Water, Trans Union LLC, filed by Chris Schaffer. (Attachments: #1 Summons to be issued as to Defendant, Trans Union LLC)(Kerney, Frank)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT #20 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/11/2019. (shl)
October 10, 2019 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (proposed order submitted) by Chris Schaffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint)(Kerney, Frank)
October 10, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Memphis Light, Gas and Water.(Comes, Diana)
October 9, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Kerney, Frank)
October 7, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Equifax Information Services, LLC's Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Yoakum, Brian)
September 18, 2019 Filing 16 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, October 16, 2019 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MEMPHIS LIGHT, GAS AND WATER'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING #13 answer due 10/10/2019. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 09/17/2019. (shl)
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall D. Noel on behalf of Memphis Light, Gas and Water (Noel, Randall)
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (proposed order submitted) by Memphis Light, Gas and Water. (Comes, Diana)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana M. Comes on behalf of Memphis Light, Gas and Water (Comes, Diana)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 10/9/2019. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 09/13/2019. (shl) Modified on 9/17/2019 (Lipman, Sheryl).
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer proposed order will be submitted by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Yoakum, Brian)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Equifax Information Services, LLC Corporate Disclosure Statement (Yoakum, Brian)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L. Yoakum on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (Yoakum, Brian)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Memphis Light, Gas and Water. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Memphis Light, Gas and Water (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3144656), filed by Chris Schaffer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to be issued as to Defendant, Equifax, #3 Summons to be issued as to Defendant, Memphis Light, Gas and Water)(Kerney, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaffer v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Brian L. Yoakum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memphis Light, Gas and Water
Represented By: Randall D. Noel
Represented By: Diana M. Comes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Schaffer
Represented By: Frank H. Kerney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?