Workers United, Southern Regional Joint Board v. Fred's Inc.
Plaintiff: Workers United, Southern Regional Joint Board
Defendant: Fred's Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02566
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, - Proposed Order Submitted by Fred's Inc.. (Trammell, Bradley)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr on 9/4/19. (Fowlkes, John)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Workers United, Southern Regional Joint Board as to Fred's Inc.. (Taylor, Timothy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Morris on behalf of Workers United, Southern Regional Joint Board (Morris, Samuel)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael B. Schoenfeld (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3149638) by Workers United, Southern Regional Joint Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Georgia, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - SD Florida)(Taylor, Timothy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Fred's Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fred's Inc., filed by Workers United, Southern Regional Joint Board. Rec# ATNWDC 3149329 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Collective Bargaining Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Severance Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Grievance, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Taylor, Timothy) Modified on 8/26/2019 to insert receipt number(jae).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Workers United, Southern Regional Joint Board v. Fred's Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Workers United, Southern Regional Joint Board
Represented By: Timothy P. Taylor
Represented By: Samuel Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred's Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?