Evans v. Wilkerson et al
Plaintiff: Ben Evans
Defendant: Ronnie Wilkerson and R & W Heating and Air and Plumbing, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02571
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 18 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 10:20 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk)
October 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Ben Evans (Hisaw, Jerry)
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 Response in Opposition to Motion and Memorandum filed by All Defendants. (Webster, Ross)
September 26, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ben Evans. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Brief in Support of Response)(Krell, Matthew)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Reid Krell on behalf of Ben Evans (Krell, Matthew)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of by R & W Heating and Air and Plumbing, Inc., Ronnie Wilkerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Webster, Ross)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 ATTACHMENT Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss to #11 MOTION to Dismiss by R & W Heating and Air and Plumbing, Inc., Ronnie Wilkerson.. (Webster, Ross)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Webster, Ross)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross Emerson Webster on behalf of R & W Heating and Air and Plumbing, Inc., Ronnie Wilkerson (Webster, Ross)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ben Evans as to Ronnie Wilkerson. (Hisaw, Jerry)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ben Evans as to R & W Heating and Air and Plumbing, Inc.. (Hisaw, Jerry)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to R & W Heating and Air and Plumbing, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ronnie Wilkerson. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3152289), filed by Ben Evans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Ronnie Wilkerson, #3 Summons Summons to R&W Heating and Air and Plumbing, Inc.)(Hisaw, Jerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Wilkerson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Wilkerson
Represented By: Ross Emerson Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & W Heating and Air and Plumbing, Inc.
Represented By: Ross Emerson Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Evans
Represented By: Jerry Wesley Hisaw
Represented By: Matthew Reid Krell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?