United States of America v. Shelby County Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Shaunita Callicutt
Garnishee: Shelby County Board of Education
Case Number: 2:2019cv02591
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Parker
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING MOTION #12 TO MAGISTRATE COURT. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 10/31/2019. (bab) (Main Document 18 replaced on 10/31/2019) (bab).
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #13 GARNISHEE'S MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 10/30/2019. (bab) (Main Document 17 replaced on 10/30/2019) (bab).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING #9 MOTION TO PAY JUDGMENT IN INSTALLMENTS AND DENYING REQUEST FOR HEARING. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 10/28/2019. (Vescovo, Diane)
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart J. Canale on behalf of United States of America (Canale, Stuart)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Quash filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Canale, Stuart)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #7 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #6 Answer to Writ of Garnishment by Shelby County Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Proposed Second Amended Answer)(Morton, Jamie)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 PRO SE MOTION to Quash Garnishment / Execute & Claim Exemption Rights by Shaunita Callicutt. (jae)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Pay Judgment by Installments (propsed order submitted) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Payment History, #2 Exhibit B - Answer of Garnishee)(Zoccola, Barbara)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING MOTION TO MAGISTRATE COURT. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 9/26/2019. (bab)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Pay Judgment by Installments by Shaunita Callicutt. (agj)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Morton on behalf of Shelby County Board of Education (Morton, Jamie)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Shelby County Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Shelby County Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 WRIT of of Garnishment issued (jae)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment (PLEASE ISSUE), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zoccola, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Shelby County Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Shelby County Board of Education
Represented By: Jamie Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaunita Callicutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Barbara M. Zoccola
Represented By: Stuart J. Canale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?