King v. Chase
Plaintiff: Kim King
Defendant: William Bartlett Chase, Jr. and GEICO (UM Carrier)
Case Number: 2:2019cv02658
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by James B. McClain, III on behalf of GEICO (UM Carrier) (McClain, James)
November 20, 2019 Filing 20 SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference is set for Thursday, 12/12/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. (jrs)
November 20, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/20/2019. Drayton D. Berkley appeared for the Plaintiff. William Christopher Frulla appeared for the Defendant. Case reviewed. Court determined parties need additional preparation for the conference. Therefore, an in-person Scheduling Conference is set for Thursday, 12/12/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. (Court Reporter: Traci Walker) (jrs)
November 11, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kim King as to GEICO (UM Carrier). (Berkley, Drayton)
November 11, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Frulla, William)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Punitive Damages Claim. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 11/8/2019. (mom)
October 30, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Punitive Damages Claim as to William Chase only filed by Kim King. (Berkley, Drayton)
October 30, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Geico Corporation. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Summons by Drayton D. Berkley on behalf of Kim King. (Berkley, Drayton)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's First Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by William Bartlett Chase, Jr.(Frulla, William)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Wednesday, 11/20/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Please follow the calling instructions on the Notice of Setting to access the conference. (jrs)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Defendant's Answer to Complaint by William Bartlett Chase, Jr.(Frulla, William)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Punitive Damages Claim by William Bartlett Chase, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Defendant's Memorandum of Facts and Law)(Frulla, William)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kim King as to William Bartlett Chase, Jr. (Berkley, Drayton)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to William Bartlett Chase, Jr. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Correction to #1 Complaint, with correct cause number. (Berkley, Drayton)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Bartlett Chase, Jr (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3178819), filed by Kim King. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Chase Summons, #3 Exhibit Discovery to Chase)(Berkley, Drayton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim King
Represented By: Drayton D. Berkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Bartlett Chase, Jr.
Represented By: William Christopher Frulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO (UM Carrier)
Represented By: James B. McClain, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?