Wimberly et al v. Campbell Clinic, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Pam Wimberly and Larry Wimberly
Defendant: Campbell Clinic, P.C. and Ashley Lewis Park
Case Number: 2:2019cv02691
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 21 SETTING LETTER: [TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED] Status Conference set for Friday, 10/2/2020 09:15 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. (wrh)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER for Mediation. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 10/05/2019. (Fowlkes, John)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/2/2020 09:15 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. ADR deadline is 9/23/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 1/22/2020. Discovery due by 9/30/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 1/23/2020. Motions due by 10/31/2020. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 12/05/2019. (Fowlkes, John)
December 5, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 12/5/2019. Counsel for Plaintiff, Frank B. Thacher, III present by telephone; Defense counsel, Marcy Dodds Magee, Natalie, Marie Bursi & Robert W. Reid present in Court. Parties update the Court as to the status of the case, Parties have exchanged some discovery in particular medical records. The Court accepts the proposed scheduling order & sets a mediation deadline for Wednesday, 09/23/2019, orders to be entered. Case set Friday, 10/02/2020 at 9:15 a.m. for Status Conference. (Court Reporter Valerie Gilliam (Alpha).) (wrh)
December 2, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Report Outlining Rule 26 Discovery Plan. (Reid, Robert)
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Login and password used to file is different from the attorney that signed the pleading. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld)
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Reid, Robert)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference is set for THURSDAY, 12/5/2019 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. PLEASE FOLLOW INSTRUCTIONS FOR SCHEDULING ON JUDGE FOWLKES' WEBSITE @https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager. (ljf)
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Reid, Robert)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Marie Bursi on behalf of Campbell Clinic, P.C., Ashley Lewis Park (Bursi, Natalie)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcy Dodds Magee on behalf of Campbell Clinic, P.C., Ashley Lewis Park (Magee, Marcy)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Reid on behalf of Campbell Clinic, P.C., Ashley Lewis Park (Reid, Robert)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Wimberly, Pam Wimberly as to Campbell Clinic, P.C.. (Thacher, Frank)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Wimberly, Pam Wimberly as to Ashley Lewis Park. (Thacher, Frank)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Ashley Lewis Park. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Campbell Clinic, P.C.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Campbell Clinic,P.C.(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3188336), filed by Larry Wimberly, Pam Wimberly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Thacher, Frank) Modified on 10/10/2019 (jld).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wimberly et al v. Campbell Clinic, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell Clinic, P.C.
Represented By: Natalie Marie Bursi
Represented By: Marcy Dodds Magee
Represented By: Robert W. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Lewis Park
Represented By: Natalie Marie Bursi
Represented By: Marcy Dodds Magee
Represented By: Robert W. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pam Wimberly
Represented By: Frank B. Thacher, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Wimberly
Represented By: Frank B. Thacher, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?