Ghosheh v. PHH Mortgage Corporation
Plaintiff: Riad Ghosheh
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation and Wilson & Associates, PLLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02710
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Mark S Norris
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 27 JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT THE WILSON LAW GROUP. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 11/20/2019. (Norris, Mark)
November 20, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION of Dismissal /Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of All Claims against Defendant The Wilson Law Group by Riad Ghosheh. (Flick, Brian)
November 18, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wilson & Associates, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum SEPERATE DEFENDANT WILSON & ASSOCIATES PLL'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS)(High, Samuel)
November 15, 2019 Filing 24 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 01/29/2020 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf)
November 14, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint, by PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Ronderos, Joseph)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING #11 WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 11/12/19. (Norris, Mark)
November 12, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by PHH Mortgage Corporation re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with proposed order submitted, 17 Setting Letter, of Filing Proposed Agreed Order Dismissing Motion and Mootness of Hearing [order submitted] (Ronderos, Joseph)
November 4, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Riad Ghosheh as to The Wilson Law Group. (Flick, Brian)
October 31, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Shaun Kevin Ramey on behalf of PHH Mortgage Corporation (Ramey, Shaun)
October 31, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph V. Ronderos, Jr on behalf of PHH Mortgage Corporation (Ronderos, Joseph)
October 30, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Setting: A Hearing on #11 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction has been set for 11/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. *TEXT NOTICE ONLY - THERE IS NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE*(cas)
October 30, 2019 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark S. Norris: Motion Hearing held on 10/30/2019 regarding #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Riad Ghosheh. Counsel Sara Rogers, Marc Dann and Brian Flick (telephone) present for the Plaintiff. Counsel Sammy High for Wilson & Associates (telephone) and Joseph Ronderos for PHH Mortgage (telephone) present for the defendants. The Court heard from the parties on the issues raised in the Motion. After hearing from the parties the Court GRANTED the Motion. The Court will not require a bond to be entered at this time. The Court set a Hearing on the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (DE#11)for 11/12/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey.) (cas)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #10 PLAINTIFF RIAD GHOSHEHS MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER PURSUANT TO CIV. R. 65(b)(1). Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 10/30/19. (Norris, Mark)
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Riad Ghosheh as to PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Flick, Brian)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 SETTING LETTER: Motion Hearing re: #10 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Pursuant to Civ. R. 65(b)(1) set for Wednesday, 10/30/2019 at 11:00 AM (CDT) in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. Plaintiff's counsel is instructed to notify counsel for the Defendant of this hearing date/time. Due to the short notice of this setting, if counsel wishes to participate by telephone, they are allowed to do so. To join the conference call, please call 877-411-9748. The access code is 7286358. (jpw)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Wilson Law Firm. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) Modified on 10/29/2019 (jld).
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with proposed order submitted by Riad Ghosheh. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit)(Flick, Brian)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Riad Ghosheh. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Mason, #2 Affidavit Counsel Certification, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Notice of Sale)(Flick, Brian)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED against PHH Mortgage Corporation, filed by Riad Ghosheh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - TPP, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - TPP Payments, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - August payment, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Sept Payment, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - September 2019 stmt, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Ocwen Narrative, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - PHH Narrative, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - notice of sale, #9 Summons Summons for Wilson and Associates)(Flick, Brian)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 ATTACHMENT Exhibit 7 to Complaint to #1 Complaint, by Riad Ghosheh.. (Flick, Brian)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 ATTACHMENT Exhibit 6 to complaint to #1 Complaint, by Riad Ghosheh.. (Flick, Brian)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to PHH Mortgage Corporation. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PHH Mortgage Corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3195030), filed by Riad Ghosheh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-TPP, #2 Exhibit 2-July TPP Payment, #3 Exhibit 3-August TPP Payment, #4 Exhibit 4-September TPP Payment, #5 Exhibit 5-September PBS, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons PHH Mortgage)(Flick, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ghosheh v. PHH Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riad Ghosheh
Represented By: Brian D. Flick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Shaun Kevin Ramey
Represented By: Joseph V. Ronderos, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson & Associates, PLLC
Represented By: Samuel S. High
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?