Small v. Alpine Access Inc. and/or Sykes Inc.
Plaintiff: Kajuana Lameka Small
Defendant: Alpine Access Inc. and/or Sykes Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02722
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Parker
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kajuana Lameka Small as to Alpine Access Inc. and/or Sykes Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jld)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 11/26/2019. (nph)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 Pro Se NOTICE of Declaration Supporting Motion Change of Venue by Kajuana Lameka Small (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jld)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Alpine Access Inc. and/or Sykes Inc.. Two summons (4 total) were mailed to plaintiff for service. (Attachments: #1 second summons)(jae)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 Pro Se MOTION to Change Venue by Kajuana Lameka Small. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jld)
November 13, 2019 Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters. Pursuant to Local Rule 4.1(b)(1), the plaintiff shall present the Clerk with a properly completed summons for each defendant, and the Clerk shall issue the summons(es) to the plaintiff for service on the defendant(s). (csf)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 Case initiation fee: PAID $ 400.00, receipt number M4676044098 (csf)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Directing Plaintiff to Pay the Filing Fee. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 10/30/2019. (kah)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (csf)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kajuana Lameka Small. (csf)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT Under Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964 Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 2000ra filed by Kajuana Lameka Small against Alpine Access Inc. and/or Sykes Inc. (Attachments: #1 EEOC Documents, #2 Supporting Documents, #3 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Small v. Alpine Access Inc. and/or Sykes Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpine Access Inc. and/or Sykes Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kajuana Lameka Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?