Williams v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Carrihuna Williams
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv02734
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
December 12, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel. John Dalimonte can withdraw as counsel effective immediately. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 12/10/2019. (kah)
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Carrihuna Williams. (Stoller, Paul)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 12/6/2019. (bab)
December 6, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3231940) by Carrihuna Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Crowell, Ashley)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 12/04/2019. (kah)
December 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3229120) by Carrihuna Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Stoller, Paul)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 12/03/2019. (kah)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 12/03/2019. (kah)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3223149) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Paine, Eric)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3223148) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Chappell, Dell)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lani D. Lester on behalf of Carrihuna Williams (Lester, Lani)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Silvestri Higgins on behalf of Carrihuna Williams (Higgins, Charles)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 10/30/2019. (kah)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Richard B. North, Jr. (proposed order submitted) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane Gibson Ramsey on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Ramsey, Shane)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-02336. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2019: #2 Exhibit judges' cards and docket sheet) (agj).
October 24, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to the Western District of Tennessee via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-02336-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16771218 filed by Carrihuna Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Shane Gibson Ramsey
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Dell P Chappell
Represented By: Eric Alfred Paine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Shane Gibson Ramsey
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Dell P Chappell
Represented By: Eric Alfred Paine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrihuna Williams
Represented By: John A Dalimonte
Represented By: Paul Lincoln Stoller
Represented By: Lani D. Lester
Represented By: Ashley Crowell
Represented By: Paul L. Stoller
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?