Jones v. Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P.
Plaintiff: Cynthia Jones
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P.
Not Yet Classified: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02747
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Satterfield Patterson on behalf of Cynthia Jones (Patterson, Ashley)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P. Service of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Walden, Bailey)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/12/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
December 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: Jury Trial set for Monday, January 25, 2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last 2-3 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, January 8, 2021. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, January 15, 2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference was held on 12/12/2019. Robert Louis Gatewood, Jr. appeared for the plaintiff. Russell E. Reviere and Bailey L. Walden appeared for the defendant. The court discussed the dates and deadlines with the parties. Jury Trial set for Monday, January 25, 2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last 2-3 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, January 8, 2021. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, January 15, 2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey) (smm)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Report of Parties Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) Planning Conference. (Reviere, Russell)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P..(Reviere, Russell)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, December 12, 2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell E. Reviere on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P. (Reviere, Russell)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. for Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P... (Walden, Bailey)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P. from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-3957-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3205518), filed by Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Walden, Bailey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P.
Represented By: Bailey L. Walden
Represented By: Russell E. Reviere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Jones
Represented By: Lan Chen
Represented By: Robert Louis Gatewood, Jr.
Represented By: Ashley Satterfield Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?