Williams v. Martinez et al
Plaintiff: Akara Williams
Defendant: Cooper Glass Company, LLC and Marvin Martinez
Not Yet Classified: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02750
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Cooper Glass Company, LLC of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Vescovo, Stephen)
December 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton assigned as presiding judge. (jae)
December 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE CANCELING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY): The parties are hereby notified that the Scheduling Conference currently set for Tuesday, December 10, 2019 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman has been canceled. The parties will receive notice of the new setting by a separate notice from the Magistrate Judge. (smm)
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2019: #1 Judge's card) (jld).
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Vescovo, Stephen)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cooper Glass Company, LLC.(Vescovo, Stephen)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, December 10, 2019 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Cooper Glass Company, LLC by Akara Williams.(Gressett, Allen)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Marvin Martinez by Akara Williams.(Gressett, Allen)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cooper Glass Company, LLC from Shelby County Circuit, case number CT-4146-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3206365), filed by Cooper Glass Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents)(Vescovo, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Martinez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akara Williams
Represented By: Allen Morgan Gressett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Glass Company, LLC
Represented By: Stephen W. Vescovo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?