Miller et al v. AutoZone Inc
Plaintiff: MICHAEL IANNONE and FAITH MILLER
Defendant: AutoZone Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv02779
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Mark S Norris
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1109
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 010620. (msn)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 010620. (msn)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 010620. (msn)
January 6, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3251051) by AutoZone Inc. (Nelson, Jonathan)
January 6, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3251047) by AutoZone Inc. (Nelson, Jonathan)
January 6, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3251043) by AutoZone Inc. (Nelson, Jonathan)
December 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Thornton on behalf of AutoZone Inc (Thornton, David)
December 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Kapellas on behalf of AutoZone Inc (Kapellas, Michael)
December 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Edward Nelson on behalf of AutoZone Inc (Nelson, Jonathan)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. AutoZone Inc. answer due 2/18/2020. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 12/17/2019. (Norris, Mark)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by AutoZone Inc. (Golwen, John)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to AutoZone Inc. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Summons by Lange Clark on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Clark, Lange)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #6 MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 11/19/2019. (Norris, Mark)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number BTNWDC-3218248) filed by Michael Iannone, Faith Miller has been filed. For future reference, please note appendix 2 was filed upside down. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number BTNWDC-3218248) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Ala Sup Ct Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Appendix USDC Northern District of Al Certificate of Good Standing)(Clark, Lange)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AutoZone Inc (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3214441), filed by FAITH MILLER, MICHAEL IANNONE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pantazis, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. AutoZone Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL IANNONE
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr.
Represented By: Lange Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAITH MILLER
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr.
Represented By: Lange Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone Inc
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Nelson
Represented By: Michael Kapellas
Represented By: David A. Thornton
Represented By: John S. Golwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?