Edwards-Bradford v. Guzman et al
Plaintiff: Patrece R. Edwards-Bradford
Defendant: Clyde Dismuke, Tina Almond and Sherri Guzman
Case Number: 2:2019cv02877
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Mark S Norris
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING #13 MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 2/12/2020. (Vescovo, Diane)
February 12, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Patrece R. Edwards-Bradford.(csf)
February 11, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM proposed order submitted by Tina Almond, Clyde Dismuke, Sherri Guzman. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum in Support)(Stocker, Jennifer)
February 11, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer J. Stocker on behalf of Tina Almond, Clyde Dismuke, Sherri Guzman (Stocker, Jennifer)
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrece R. Edwards-Bradford as to Tina Almond. (agj)
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrece R. Edwards-Bradford as to Clyde Dismuke. (agj)
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrece R. Edwards-Bradford as to Sherri Guzman. (agj)
December 23, 2019 Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters. Pursuant to Local Rule 4.1(b)(1), the plaintiff shall present the Clerk with a properly completed summons for each defendant, and the Clerk shall issue the summons(es) to the plaintiff for service on the defendant(s). (csf)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE: Signed agreement to receive notice of electronic filing (NEF) by Patrece R. Edwards-Bradford (csf)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sherri Guzman. (jld)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Tina Almond. (jld)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Clyde Dismuke. (jld) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/20/2019) (jld).
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400), filed by Patrece R. Edwards-Bradford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Notice, #2 Agreement to Receive NEF, #3 Receipt #M4676044456, #4 Judge's Cards)(jld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards-Bradford v. Guzman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Dismuke
Represented By: Jennifer J. Stocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Almond
Represented By: Jennifer J. Stocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Guzman
Represented By: Jennifer J. Stocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrece R. Edwards-Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?