Taylor v. Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Plaintiff: Renee Jackson Taylor
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC d/b/a Cardinal Nuclear Pharmacy Services and Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Clerk W. Aaron Hall
Case Number: 2:2020cv02004
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Protective Order proposed order submitted by Cardinal Health 110, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Joint Protective Order)(Treherne, Gretchen)
February 28, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cardinal Health 110, LLC, filed by Renee Jackson Taylor.(Garner, Linda)
February 20, 2020 Filing 15 SETTING LETTER: The Jury Trial is set for Monday, 12/14/2020 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 12/4/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 11/23/2020. (jrs)
February 20, 2020 Filing 14 Minute Entryfor proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 2/20/2020. Linda Kendall Garner appeared for the Plaintiff. Gretchen M Treherne and Craig A. Cowart appeared for the Defendant. Complaint deemed amended to proper entity, Cardinal Health 414. Amended Complaint due 2/28/2020. Protective Order to be submitted by 3/2/2020. Case reviewed and schedule set. The Jury Trial is set for Monday, 12/14/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Trial is estimated to last 3-4 days. The Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 12/4/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 11/23/2020. A Scheduling Order will be entered. (Court Reporter: Lisa Mayo) (jrs)
February 13, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Cowart, Craig)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice *TEXT ORDER ONLY*. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/24/2020. (mom)
January 23, 2020 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Thursday, 2/20/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
January 22, 2020 Filing 10 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted filed by Cardinal Health 110, LLC has been filed. For future reference, please note: Proposed order should not be published to CM/ECF, but only emailed to chambers. If no proposed order previously emailed to chambers, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Fee paid with REC# ATNWDC 3265092) by Cardinal Health 110, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supreme Court of Ohio - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Southern District of Ohio - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Treherne, Gretchen) Modified on 1/22/2020 to include rec #(jae).
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health 110, LLC. (Cowart, Craig)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Cardinal Health 110, LLC.(Cowart, Craig)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Cardinal Health 110, LLC d/b/a Cardinal Nuclear Pharmacy Services has been filed. For future reference, please note "Wet Signature" on the civil cover sheet. Please see ECF Policies and Proceedures 10.1. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld)
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cardinal Health 110, LLC d/b/a Cardinal Nuclear Pharmacy Services from Chancery Court of Shelby County, Tennessee, case number CH-19-1043 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3250471), filed by Cardinal Health 110, LLC d/b/a Cardinal Nuclear Pharmacy Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Ryan McGraw, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to State Court of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cowart, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Jackson Taylor
Represented By: Linda Kendall Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC d/b/a Cardinal Nuclear Pharmacy Services
Represented By: Craig A. Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Represented By: Craig A. Cowart
Represented By: Gretchen M Treherne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk W. Aaron Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?