Hunter et al v. Newrez, LLC
Plaintiff: Emma Hunter and Jerry Hunter
Defendant: Newrez, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Clerk & Master Amy Anderson
Case Number: 2:2020cv02016
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Newrez, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in support of Motion to Dismiss)(Linkowski, Brian)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 2/21/2020. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 02/14/2020. (Mays, Samuel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Newrez, LLC. (Kelly, Lawrence)
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence W. Kelly on behalf of Newrez, LLC (Kelly, Lawrence)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Brian Linkowski for Newrez, LLC. Attorney Erin Alexandra McFall terminated. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 02/14/2020. (Mays, Samuel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Substitute Attorney (Proposed Order Submitted) by Newrez, LLC. (McFall, Erin)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for the management of the case; all pretrial matters within the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) for determination; and all other pretrial matters for report and recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B)-(c). Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 01/15/2020. (Mays, Samuel)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Newrez, LLC answer due 2/14/2020. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 01/14/2020. (Mays, Samuel)
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, (Proposed Order Submitted) by Newrez, LLC. (McFall, Erin)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (jld) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/9/2020) (jld).
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Newrez, LLC from Fayette County Chancery Court, case number 17845 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3253914), filed by Newrez, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Pleadings)(McFall, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter et al v. Newrez, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newrez, LLC
Represented By: Erin Alexandra McFall
Represented By: Brian Linkowski
Represented By: Lawrence W. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk & Master Amy Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?