Zepeda-Hernandez v. Mariscos El Quetzal, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rosbi Zepeda-Hernandez
Defendant: Mariscos El Quetzal, LLC and Audelio Chilel
Case Number: 2:2020cv02028
Filed: January 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER APPROVING RESOLUTION OF FLSA CLAIM AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING THE CASE. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 3/5/2020. (mom)
March 5, 2020 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Approval of FLSA Settlement (proposed order submitted) by Rosbi Zepeda-Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Settlement Agreement)(Ashby, Bryce)
February 25, 2020 Filing 15 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Thursday, 3/26/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 *TEXT ORDER* granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall file a response to the Complaint by no later than March 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 2/18/2020. (mom)
February 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Amann, Robert)
February 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Amann on behalf of All Defendants (Amann, Robert)
February 4, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosbi Zepeda-Hernandez as to Mariscos El Quetzal, LLC. (Ashby, Bryce)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosbi Zepeda-Hernandez as to Audelio Chilel. (Ashby, Bryce)
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Audelio Chilel. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Mariscos El Quetzal, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (jld)
January 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Ryan on behalf of Rosbi Zepeda-Hernandez (Ryan, William)
January 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Janelle Crandall Osowski on behalf of Rosbi Zepeda-Hernandez (Osowski, Janelle)
January 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT under the FLSA against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3257806), filed by Rosbi Zepeda-Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Memorandum for Mariscos El Quetzal LLC, #3 Summons for Audelio Chilel)(Ashby, Bryce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zepeda-Hernandez v. Mariscos El Quetzal, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariscos El Quetzal, LLC
Represented By: Robert Amann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audelio Chilel
Represented By: Robert Amann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosbi Zepeda-Hernandez
Represented By: Janelle Crandall Osowski
Represented By: Bryce William Ashby
Represented By: William B. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?