Amerson v. Volvo Group North America, LLC
Plaintiff: Shirley Amerson
Defendant: Volvo Group North America, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02050
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Mark S Norris
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
2 Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2615a
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 17 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 05/19/2020 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf)
March 9, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Volvo Group North America, LLC.(Prather, Paul)
February 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela R. Irons on behalf of Volvo Group North America, LLC (Irons, Pamela)
February 14, 2020 Filing 14 Judge Mark S. Norris added. (jld)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 02/14/2020. (kah)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER granting #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The new deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is 03/09/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 02/14/2020. (kah)
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Prather, Paul)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint proposed order submitted by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Prather, Paul)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Prather on behalf of Volvo Group North America, LLC (Prather, Paul)
January 30, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shirley Amerson as to Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Donati, Donald)
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Volvo Group North America, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald A. Donati on behalf of Shirley Amerson (Donati, Donald)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Volvo Group North America, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3265774), filed by Shirley Amerson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Volvo Group North America, LLC)(Ashby, Bryce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amerson v. Volvo Group North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Amerson
Represented By: Donald A. Donati
Represented By: Bryce William Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volvo Group North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?