Barbaro v. 42 U.S.C. 654(3) Child Support Divsion et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Lee Barbaro
Defendant: 42 U.S.C. 654(3) Child Support Divsion, Debra Sanders, Sheldon Y. McCall, 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Sheriff's Department, 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Clerk of Court, Juvenile Division, 45 C.F.R 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Jail, Mitzi Pollard, MAXIMUS, Inc., 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County, 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Juvenile Court, Jonjula Jones, Lyttonia Cunningham, James Franklin, Jr. and Alycia Chism
Case Number: 2:2020cv02177
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 First MOTION to Dismiss and for injunctive relief filed by 45 C.F.R 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Jail, 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County, 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Clerk of Court, Juvenile Division, 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Juvenile Court, 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Sheriff's Department, Alycia Chism, Lyttonia Cunningham, James Franklin, Jr, Sheldon Y. McCall, Mitzi Pollard, Debra Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Durrence, Jasen)
May 8, 2020 Filing 23 First MOTION to Dismiss and for injunctive relief by 45 C.F.R 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Jail, 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County, 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Clerk of Court, Juvenile Division, 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Juvenile Court, 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Sheriff's Department, Alycia Chism, Lyttonia Cunningham, James Franklin, Jr, Sheldon Y. McCall, Mitzi Pollard, Debra Sanders. (Durrence, Jasen)
May 7, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jasen McCoy Durrence on behalf of 45 C.F.R 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Jail, 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County, 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Clerk of Court, Juvenile Division, 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Juvenile Court, 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Sheriff's Department, Alycia Chism, Lyttonia Cunningham, James Franklin, Jr, Sheldon Y. McCall, Mitzi Pollard, Debra Sanders (Durrence, Jasen)
May 7, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jonjula Jones, MAXIMUS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Barbaro v. 45 C.F.R. Sec. 75.2 Contractor, No. 2:18-CV-2837)(Weaver, Jennifer)
May 7, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jonjula Jones, MAXIMUS, Inc.. (Weaver, Jennifer)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff seeks "a 14-day extension of time to reply to Defendants Rule 11 motion which was filed on April 22, 2020." (ECF No. 18.) There is no such motion pending on the docket, and no filings occurred on the date specified. Accordingly, plaintiff's motion for extension of time is hereby denied as moot. It is so ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 5/1/2020. (TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY) (jrs)
April 30, 2020 Filing 18 PRO SE MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Daniel Lee Barbaro. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING #16 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Daniel Lee Barbaro. Signed by Clerk of Court on April 15, 2020. (jae)
April 14, 2020 Filing 16 PRO SE MOTION for Entry of Default by Daniel Lee Barbaro. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit entry of default submitted by plaintiff, #3 Exhibit)(jae)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for all Defendants to file an answer is hereby extended up to and including May 7, 2020. It is so ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 4/9/2020. (TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY) (jrs)
April 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lyn Weaver on behalf of Jonjula Jones, MAXIMUS, Inc. (Weaver, Jennifer)
April 7, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Pro Se Complaint or otherwise respond to Complaint (proposed order submitted) by 45 C.F.R 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Jail, 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County, 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Clerk of Court, Juvenile Division, 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Juvenile Court, 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Sheriff's Department, Alycia Chism, Lyttonia Cunningham, James Franklin, Jr, Sheldon Y. McCall, Mitzi Pollard, Debra Sanders. (Jones, John)
March 20, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Lee Barbaro as to All Defendants. 42 U.S.C. 654(3) Child Support Division (Program) (Attachments: #1 Shelby County, Tennessee, #2 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Clerk Juvenile Court, #3 Lyttonia Cunningham, #4 James Franklin, Jr., #5 Sheldon Y. McCall, #6 Alycia Chism, #7 Mitzi Pollard, #8 Debra Sanders, #9 Shelby County Juvenile Court, #10 Jonjula Jones, #11 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Sheriff's Department, #12 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Jail, #13 Maximus, Inc.)(csf)
March 13, 2020 Filing 11 ATTACHMENT to #1 Pro Se Complaint by Daniel Lee Barbaro.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N, #2 Exhibit O, #3 Exhibit P, #4 Exhibit R, #5 Exhibit S, #6 Exhibit T, #7 Exhibit U, #8 Exhibit V)(jae)
March 13, 2020 Filing 10 ATTACHMENT to #1 Pro Se Complaint by Daniel Lee Barbaro.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(jae)
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Mitzi Pollard, #2 Debra Sanders, #3 Clerk of Court - Juvenile Division, #4 Shelby County Tennessee, #5 Child Support Program, #6 Sheldon McCall, #7 Jonjula Jones, #8 Lyttonia Cunningham, #9 James Franklin, Jr, #10 Shelby County Juvenile Court, #11 Shelby County Sheriff's Department, #12 Maximus, #13 Shelby County Jail)(jae)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (csf)
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE Declined agreement to Receive notice of electronic filing (NEF) by Daniel Lee Barbaro (csf)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION For Preliminary Injunction/Demand for IV-D Foreign Corporation to Cease from Illegally Seizing Property. by Daniel Lee Barbaro. (csf)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION Demanding Court to Intervene to Cease IV-D Agency/Foreign Corporation from Illegally Incarcerating Plaintiff by Daniel Lee Barbaro. (csf)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 Case initiation fee: PAID $ 400.00, receipt number M4676045279 (csf)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT Violation of Civil Rights Under 42 U.S.C. 1983 filed by Daniel Lee Barbaro against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Judicial Cards)(csf)
March 11, 2020 Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters. Pursuant to Local Rule 4.1(b)(1), the plaintiff shall present the Clerk with a properly completed summons for each defendant, and the Clerk shall issue the summons(es) to the plaintiff for service on the defendant(s). (csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbaro v. 42 U.S.C. 654(3) Child Support Divsion et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 42 U.S.C. 654(3) Child Support Divsion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Sanders
Represented By: John Marshall Jones
Represented By: Jasen McCoy Durrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheldon Y. McCall
Represented By: John Marshall Jones
Represented By: Jasen McCoy Durrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: John Marshall Jones
Represented By: Jasen McCoy Durrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Clerk of Court, Juvenile Division
Represented By: John Marshall Jones
Represented By: Jasen McCoy Durrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 45 C.F.R 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Jail
Represented By: John Marshall Jones
Represented By: Jasen McCoy Durrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitzi Pollard
Represented By: John Marshall Jones
Represented By: Jasen McCoy Durrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAXIMUS, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Lyn Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County
Represented By: John Marshall Jones
Represented By: Jasen McCoy Durrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 45 C.F.R. 75.2 Contractor Shelby County Juvenile Court
Represented By: John Marshall Jones
Represented By: Jasen McCoy Durrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonjula Jones
Represented By: Jennifer Lyn Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyttonia Cunningham
Represented By: John Marshall Jones
Represented By: Jasen McCoy Durrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Franklin, Jr.
Represented By: John Marshall Jones
Represented By: Jasen McCoy Durrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alycia Chism
Represented By: John Marshall Jones
Represented By: Jasen McCoy Durrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lee Barbaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?